Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crown Property Management, Inc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Gutknecht, Ryan K., in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Return - Mail | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute POSTED NORI and Cert of Mailing |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof - Posting Public Notice | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Mailing | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.