Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The United States Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Olmstead, Maxine E, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Matthew Tracey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew Tracey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return - Mail Notice Entry Judgment: 01/18/23 |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Denial
Judge: Tracey, Matthew |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document dismissal Judge: Williams, Wes |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion - Continuance | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof - Posting Public Notice | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Mailing | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.