Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Centurion Real Estate Management Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Green, Bobby, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Wes Williams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWes Williams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute Posted 01/06/2023 |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ - Execution | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute NORI Posted |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Williams, Wes |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Mailing | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.