Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Scandia Rv Park, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Et Al., Lueck, Brandon, Lueck, Kenton, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Return - Mail | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Restitution Issued Move out date 2/8/23 |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service Personally: NORI |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Posting Public Notice NORI |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Restitution Issued MOVE OUT DATE 2/8/23 |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Digitized Judgment Document | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Miller, Walter R |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Posting Public Notice Posted; Summons, Complaint And Exhibits |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service Personally: Summons, Complaint and Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.