Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shepard Investment Group Dba Umbrella Properties Mgt, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Elder, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Non Compliance
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request - Hearing - GRANTED |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service POSTED; NORI |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum PROPOSED NORI |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Restitution Issued MOVE OUT DATE: 2/28/23 |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Non-Compliance And General Judgment. Attachments Certificate of Mailing, Defendants Request for Hearing and Stipulated Agreement and Order (to HGOF 2.16.23) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Stay Proceedings | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Stipulated and mediated agreement Judge: McIver, Michelle A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.