Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Phillips, Michael Todd, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Berry, Clinton, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims - General |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document SC General Jgmnt & Money Award Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit - List | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation - No Agreement | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing - Mediation | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Consent to mediation |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Assignment - Mediation | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Deny and Demand a Hearing - to Katrina |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.