Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lava Ridge Property Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Al, Et, Kjellesvik, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Raymond D. Crutchley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond D. Crutchley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document general dismissal |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Crutchley, Raymond D. |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Return - Service (Not Served) | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing COPY OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONC HEARING |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing COPY OF COMPLAINT, SUM,MONS, AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing COPY OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons AMENDED |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.