Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jason Trout - Trout Realty, Miles Blackhawk - Trout Realty, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against And All Others, Mora, Rosa, represented by Garcia, Wesley, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Alison M. Emerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlison M. Emerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Emerson, Alison Michelle |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Representation | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Posted Summons |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Posting Public Notice Posted; Summons, Complaint and Exhibit(S) |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Posting Public Notice Posting; Summons, Complaint and Exhibit(s) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.