Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The Bluffs Wishrock Llc, Guardian Management Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Althouse, Michael, against Other Occupants, And All, Wallulatum, Justine, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Motion for Relief from Judgment Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Closed | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document general judgment Judge: McIver, Michelle A |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit (Proposed Answer) |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion - Relief from Judgment | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion to Set Aside Deafult Judgment |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: McIver, Michelle A |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter (HGOF 12/16/22) |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service POSTED: Summons, complaint and Exhibits |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing Notice of Telephonic hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.