Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mckinley, David Mark, Mckinley, Stephanie M., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Edwards, Craig K, against Dalli, Greg, Dicarlo, Lora, Uccellini Inc, Dba Lora Dicarlo, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - General |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document general judgment Judge: McIver, Michelle A |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Closed | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: McIver, Michelle A |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service Served Uccellini Inc C/O Mary P Hull Register Agent |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service POSTED; SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing COPY OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing COPY OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.