Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hecht, Kevin, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Klinger, Nathan, against Edwards, Racheal, Occupants Of The Premises, And All Other, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Alycia M. Herriott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlycia M. Herriott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - General |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ - Execution | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Posting Public Notice POSTED ; NORI, JUDGMENT. |
|
December 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Set Aside - DENIED |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Restitution Issued MOVE OUT DATE 12/28/22 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum PROPOSED NORI |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Closed | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continuance Defendants Motion to Setover Trial, Declaration of Defendant in Support of Defendant's Motion to Setover Trial & Order on Defendants Motion to Setover Trial. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.