We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

15Cv19670

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago

Henevoy, Amanda, filed a(n) Identity Record case in the jurisdiction of Benton County, OR, . Benton County, OR Superior Courts with Matthew J. Donohue presiding.

Case Details for Henevoy, Amanda v.

Judge

Matthew J. Donohue

Filing Date

July 24, 2015

Category

Identity Record

Last Refreshed

November 11, 2023

Filing Location

Benton County, OR

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for Henevoy, Amanda v.

Plaintiffs

Henevoy, Amanda

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Case Events for Henevoy, Amanda v.

Type Description
Docket Event Proof - Posting Public Notice
Docket Event Certificate - Document Preparation
Docket Event Closed
Docket Event Notice
name change
Docket Event Digitized Judgment Document
General Jgm of Name Change

Judge: Donohue, Matthew

Docket Event Notice
to change name ptn
Docket Event Proof - Posting Public Notice
Docket Event Petition - Name Change
last Step
See all events

Related Content in Benton County

Case

Avenue5 Residential LLC,North Pointe ICG LLC vs John Whitewater, And All Others
Jun 14, 2024 | Paula Brownhill | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | 24LT12239

Case

In the Matter of: Burton Jay Burreson
Jul 10, 2024 | Matthew J. Donohue | Estate - General | Estate - General | 24PB06209

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Reta Holder
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32775

Case

In the Matter of: Kimberly Dawn Robinson
Jul 10, 2024 | Estate - General | Estate - General | 24PB06211

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Jessica B Mitchell
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32778

Case

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs Audry Johnson
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32783

Case

Layton D Fitzgerald vs Ruth W Fitzgerald
Jul 06, 2024 | Dissolution | Dissolution | 24DR11424

Case

In the Matter of: Mary Katherine Reed
Jul 08, 2024 | Matthew J. Donohue | Estate - General | Estate - General | 24PB06112

Case

Discover Bank vs Jacolby L Benson
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32785

Case

Miguel Amador-Olvera vs Maria Isabel Torres
Jul 12, 2024 | Petition Custody/Support/Visitation | Petition Custody/Support/Visitation | 24DR11820

Case

Camas Commons, LP Linn Benton Housing Authority vs Tonie Jeanetta Athill, Et Al
Jun 24, 2024 | Joan E. Demarest | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | 24LT12756

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Juan C Mendoza
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33229

Case

Sebastian Bartlett vs Helena Messner
Mar 27, 2024 | Small Claims - General | Small Claims - General | 24SC09669

Case

Ariana Berenice Lopez Espino vs Naresh Tammabatula
Jul 12, 2024 | Authority, Administrative | Dissolution | Dissolution | 24DR11788

Case

Kathryn M Aguara vs Kingsley Aguara
Jul 11, 2024 | Dissolution | Dissolution | 24DR11686

Case

Christine Bolf vs Carolyn Ayers, And All Others
Jun 26, 2024 | Joan E. Demarest | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | 24LT13037

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Brian Herrera
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32780

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Alexa Guerra
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33241

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Alice Blum
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33221

Case

Bank Of America, N.A. vs Kim Strobel
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33464

Case

In the Matter of: Shelby Marie Carter
Jul 08, 2024 | Matthew J. Donohue | Identity Record | Identity Record | 24CV32589

Case

LVNV Funding LLC vs Stephanie Butler
Jul 06, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32316

Case

Spring Oaks Capital Spv, Llc vs Zillah Batres
Jul 11, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33682

Case

Discover Bank vs Johanna G Moa
Jul 12, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33680

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Miguel Zepedabrambila
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32777