We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

England, Larry R. Vs Les Schwab Tire Centers Of Portland

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

England, Larry R., filed a(n) Tort - General case represented by Busse, Richard C, against Les Schwab Tire Centers Of Portland, represented by O'Kasey, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, OR, . Benton County, OR Superior Courts .

Case Details for England, Larry R. v. Les Schwab Tire Centers Of Portland

Filing Date

December 29, 2014

Category

Tort - General

Last Refreshed

October 01, 2022

Filing Location

Benton County, OR

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for England, Larry R. v. Les Schwab Tire Centers Of Portland

Plaintiffs

England, Larry R.

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Busse, Richard C

Defendants

Les Schwab Tire Centers Of Portland

Attorneys for Defendants

O'Kasey, Karen

Case Events for England, Larry R. v. Les Schwab Tire Centers Of Portland

Type Description
Docket Event Digitized Judgment Document
Stipulated Genreal Judgment of Dismissal

Judge: Connell, David B

Docket Event Notice - Judgment Entry
Docket Event Closed
Docket Event Complaint - Amended
Docket Event Answer
Docket Event Issue - At Issue
Docket Event Proof - Service
and summons
Docket Event Order
stipulated tosub of party def & change of case caption

Judge: Donohue, Matthew

Docket Event Service
Docket Event Complaint
See all events

Related Content in Benton County

Case

Avenue5 Residential LLC,North Pointe ICG LLC vs John Whitewater, And All Others
Jun 14, 2024 | Paula Brownhill | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | 24LT12239

Case

In the Matter of: Burton Jay Burreson
Jul 10, 2024 | Matthew J. Donohue | Estate - General | Estate - General | 24PB06209

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Reta Holder
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32775

Case

In the Matter of: Kimberly Dawn Robinson
Jul 10, 2024 | Estate - General | Estate - General | 24PB06211

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Jessica B Mitchell
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32778

Case

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs Audry Johnson
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32783

Case

Layton D Fitzgerald vs Ruth W Fitzgerald
Jul 06, 2024 | Dissolution | Dissolution | 24DR11424

Case

In the Matter of: Mary Katherine Reed
Jul 08, 2024 | Matthew J. Donohue | Estate - General | Estate - General | 24PB06112

Case

Discover Bank vs Jacolby L Benson
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32785

Case

Miguel Amador-Olvera vs Maria Isabel Torres
Jul 12, 2024 | Petition Custody/Support/Visitation | Petition Custody/Support/Visitation | 24DR11820

Case

Camas Commons, LP Linn Benton Housing Authority vs Tonie Jeanetta Athill, Et Al
Jun 24, 2024 | Joan E. Demarest | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | 24LT12756

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Juan C Mendoza
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33229

Case

Sebastian Bartlett vs Helena Messner
Mar 27, 2024 | Small Claims - General | Small Claims - General | 24SC09669

Case

Ariana Berenice Lopez Espino vs Naresh Tammabatula
Jul 12, 2024 | Authority, Administrative | Dissolution | Dissolution | 24DR11788

Case

Kathryn M Aguara vs Kingsley Aguara
Jul 11, 2024 | Dissolution | Dissolution | 24DR11686

Case

Christine Bolf vs Carolyn Ayers, And All Others
Jun 26, 2024 | Joan E. Demarest | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | Landlord/Tenant - Residential Eviction | 24LT13037

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Brian Herrera
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32780

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Alexa Guerra
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33241

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Alice Blum
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33221

Case

Bank Of America, N.A. vs Kim Strobel
Jul 10, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33464

Case

In the Matter of: Shelby Marie Carter
Jul 08, 2024 | Matthew J. Donohue | Identity Record | Identity Record | 24CV32589

Case

LVNV Funding LLC vs Stephanie Butler
Jul 06, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32316

Case

Spring Oaks Capital Spv, Llc vs Zillah Batres
Jul 11, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33682

Case

Discover Bank vs Johanna G Moa
Jul 12, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV33680

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Miguel Zepedabrambila
Jul 09, 2024 | Contract | Contract | 24CV32777