Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Cadruvi, Tonya L, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2008 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.