Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
San Joaquin, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Corona, Gilbert, Jr, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth J. Hara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Enforcement
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant of Attachment Returned | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Enforcement
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Warrant of Attachment Returned | |
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Warrant of Attachment Issued | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Warrant of Attachment Returned | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.