Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Legrande, Julian Steve, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.