Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fuel Fitness Llc, filed a(n) case against Erin Baskin, Qualified Athletics, Llc, William Baskin, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts with Brandon S. Kinsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon S. Kinsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: May 28, 2021ORDER: Recusing
Date: November 19, 2021COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: April 15, 2021ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: November 22, 2021ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: April 15, 2021SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: April 15, 2021SERVICE: Certificate
Date: April 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.