Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
John N Gietzen, filed a(n) Cv case against Ken S. Ota, Douglas Cunningham, Jeffrey H. Burg, Jerry G Landau, Arizona Board Of Osteopathic Examiners, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with BRANDON KINSEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDON KINSEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00RESPONSE: TO MOTION
Date: June 24, 2020REPLY: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION
Date: June 17, 2020ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: June 11, 2020MOTION: STRIKE
Date: June 12, 2020MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: June 03, 2020STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: September 25, 2020REPLY: Reply
Date: July 06, 2020ORDER: Recusing
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00RESPONSE: TO MOTION
Date: June 05, 2020ORDER: DISMISSING CASE W/ PREJUDICE
Date: September 28, 2020APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: June 11, 2020NOTICE: Notice
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT OF A PERSON
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00MOTION: Motion
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.