Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thomas O Park, filed a(n) Cv case against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with BRANDON KINSEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDON KINSEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
NOTICE: Notice
Date: April 17, 2020ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: April 17, 2020MOTION: Extension of Time
Date: April 08, 2020SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: March 17, 2020ORDER: Order
Date: April 14, 2020ORDER: DEFERRING FEES
Date: March 17, 2020ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: March 17, 2020COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: March 17, 2020ORDER: Order
Date: May 05, 2020APPLICATION: FOR DEFERRAL OF FEES
Date: March 17, 2020NOTICE: Notice
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00DEMAND: Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.