Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rebecca Wright, filed a(n) Cv case against Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with COMMISSIONER LEVI GUNDERSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOMMISSIONER LEVI GUNDERSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2017 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
ORDER: Order
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: October 06, 2017ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00ORDER: DISMISSING CASE W/ PREJUDICE
Date: February 22, 2018NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Date: January 26, 2018ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: May 09, 2017ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00STIPULATION: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME
Date: October 05, 2017ORDER: VACATING JURY TRIAL
Date: February 01, 2018MOTION: Dismiss
Date: February 20, 2018ORDER: Order
Date: November 21, 2017STIPULATION: STIPULATION
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00DEMAND: Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00MOTION: Extension of Time
Date: November 20, 2017ORDER: SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00ORDER: CONTINUING JURY TRIAL
Date: November 02, 2017COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.