Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Debbie Ewing, filed a(n) Cv case against Alvin Bud Thompson, Sharon Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON JOHN PLANTE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON JOHN PLANTE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2017 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
ORDER: DISMISSING CASE W/ PREJUDICE
Date: September 28, 2017STIPULATION: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME
Date: July 03, 2017STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: September 25, 2017NOTICE: Notice
Date: February 15, 2017NOTICE: CHANGE OF JUDGE RULE 42(F)
Date: February 15, 2017SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00ORDER: Extending Time
Date: July 11, 2017ORDER: Assigning to Presiding Judge for Reassignment
Date: February 17, 2017ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2017COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: February 07, 2017ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: February 22, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.