Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Raymond Alfonso Mascarenas, filed a(n) Cv case in the jurisdiction of Yavapai County, AZ, . Yavapai County, AZ Superior Courts Yavapai County Superior with MICHAEL BLUFF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL BLUFF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYavapai County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYavapai County Superior |
ORDER: Resetting
Date: December 14, 2020REPLY: Reply
Date: December 14, 2020CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail
Date: February 02, 2021MINUTE ENTRY: HEARING
Date: December 21, 2020RESPONSE: TO PETITION
Date: December 08, 2020PETITION: Habeas Corpus
Date: December 01, 2020ORDER: SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: December 01, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.