Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jimmie L Washington, filed a(n) Cv case in the jurisdiction of Yavapai County, AZ, . Yavapai County, AZ Superior Courts Yavapai County Superior with MICHAEL BLUFF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL BLUFF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2018 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYavapai County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYavapai County Superior |
ORDER: COURT ORDER / RULING
Date: April 20, 2018MOTION: Reconsideration
Date: April 16, 2018NOTICE: Change of Address
Date: August 16, 2018PETITION: Habeas Corpus
Date: March 19, 2018ORDER: COURT ORDER / RULING
Date: March 30, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.