We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

William Evan Williams Vs Rowle Simmons Et Al.

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

William Evan Williams, filed a(n) Cv case against Chip Davis, Craig Brown, Jack Smith, Rowle Simmons, Thomas Thurman, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Yavapai County. This case was filed in Yavapai County Superior Courts Yavapai County Superiorwith MICHAEL BLUFF presiding.

Case Details

Judge

MICHAEL BLUFF Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

May 07, 2015

Category

Cv

Last Refreshed

March 20, 2022

Filing Location

Yavapai County, AZ

Filing Court House

Yavapai County Superior

Case Documents

RESPONSE: TO MOTION

Date: September 08, 2015

ORDER: Denying

Date: November 06, 2015

REPLY: Reply

Date: August 10, 2015

RESPONSE: TO MOTION

Date: September 28, 2015

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00

REPLY: Reply

Date: September 21, 2015

ORDER: Order

Date: 2015-07-07T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00

ORDER: Reassignment of Judge

Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00

ORDER: Denying

Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00

COMPLAINT: AMENDED COMPLAINT

Date: 2015-06-02T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: July 20, 2015

ORDER: Denying

Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00

RESPONSE: TO MOTION

Date: August 12, 2015

REPLY: Reply

Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00

ORDER: Extending Time

Date: August 19, 2015

ORDER: Reassignment of Judge

Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00

MOTION: Dismiss

Date: July 31, 2015

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00

MOTION: Dismiss

Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00

ORDER: VACATING

Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: Denying
Docket Event ORDER: DISMISSING CASE W/ PREJUDICE
Docket Event RESPONSE: TO MOTION
Docket Event REPLY: Reply
Docket Event RESPONSE: TO MOTION
Docket Event ORDER: Extending Time
Docket Event RESPONSE: TO MOTION
Docket Event REPLY: Reply
Docket Event MOTION: Dismiss
Docket Event SERVICE: Certificate
See all events