Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Cv case against Peggy Bailey, William Bailey, in the jurisdiction of Yavapai County, AZ, . Yavapai County, AZ Superior Courts Yavapai County Superior with MICHAEL BLUFF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL BLUFF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2013 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYavapai County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYavapai County Superior |
ANSWER: OF GARNISHEE
Date: July 14, 2014APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: April 10, 2014ANSWER: OF GARNISHEE
Date: August 04, 2014SERVICE: Certificate
Date: April 24, 2014WRIT: OF GARNISHMENT
Date: April 10, 2014JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2017JUDGMENT: TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2013SERVICE: Certificate
Date: April 23, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.