Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miller, Marcia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Jones, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2007 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Protective Restraining Order | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition with Minor Children | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.