Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
- filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County, AZ, . Santa Cruz County, AZ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, AZ |
|
ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJ
Date: July 06, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: July 06, 2022NOTICE: PLACING ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR
Date: August 08, 2022CHANGE OF VENUE: Change of Venue Transmitted
Date: August 15, 2022COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: July 06, 2022MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: July 06, 2022MOTION: Change of Venue
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER: TRANSFER
Date: August 15, 2022INDICATOR: DISCOVERY TIER 1
Date: July 06, 2022CHANGE OF VENUE: Change of Venue Transmitted
Date: August 16, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.