Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
- filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County, AZ, . Santa Cruz County, AZ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, AZ |
|
MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: April 01, 2022MOTION: Change of Venue
Date: April 01, 2022ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: March 29, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: February 24, 2022INDICATOR: DISCOVERY TIER 1
Date: February 24, 2022SERVICE: Certificate
Date: March 24, 2022ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJ
Date: February 24, 2022COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00CHANGE OF VENUE: Change of Venue Transmitted
Date: April 22, 2022ORDER: Change of Venue
Date: April 11, 2022Receipt: Receipt for Change of Venue Forwarded
Date: April 28, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.