Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County, AZ, . Santa Cruz County, AZ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2022 |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2022 |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, AZ |
Minute Entry: Vacating
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE: REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Entry: Motion - Continue
Date: January 28, 2022COMPLAINT: EVICTION ACTION (ENTRY)
Date: January 21, 2022MOTION: Continue
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE: Lodging
Date: February 15, 2022MOTION: Appear Telephonically
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER: Continuing
Date: February 15, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.