Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Samantha Carlson, Robert Kellock, Richard Bauerbach, filed a(n) Cv case against Cactus Flower, Ronald Robinson, Town Of Patagonia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County, AZ, . Santa Cruz County, AZ Superior Courts Santa Cruz County Superior with SHEILA DAGUCON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHEILA DAGUCON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Cruz County Superior |
SERVICE: Certificate
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE: Appearance
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE: Hearing
Date: January 11, 2022MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: December 09, 2021MOTION: Motion
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: January 07, 2022COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: December 07, 2021STIPULATION: STIPULATION
Date: January 20, 2022MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: December 07, 2021SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: December 07, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.