Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porter, James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Porter, Carrie, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.