Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
- filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Graham County, AZ, . Graham County, AZ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGraham County, AZ |
|
SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00INDICATOR: DISCOVERY TIER 2
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: IN SUPPORT OF
Date: September 14, 2022MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: September 14, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: July 26, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: August 24, 2022MOTION: Motion
Date: September 14, 2022COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00COMPLAINT: AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT: AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00SERVICE: Return of Service
Date: August 16, 2022SERVICE: Return of Service
Date: August 02, 2022SERVICE: Return of Service
Date: September 12, 2022ORDER: ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.