Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
- filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Graham County, AZ, . Graham County, AZ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGraham County, AZ |
|
ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00ORDER: SETTING
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00INDICATOR: DISCOVERY TIER 1
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJ
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE: Certificate
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00APPLICATION: FOR DEFERRAL OF FEES
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00NOTICE: COURT NOTICE
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00ORDER: DEFERRING FEES
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00STATEMENT: of Facts
Date: July 26, 2022STATEMENT: of Costs
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 26, 2022MOTION: STAY
Date: September 15, 2022MINUTE ENTRY: STATUS HEARING
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE: Filing Service
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: September 27, 2022MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2022STATEMENT: Financial Statement
Date: August 24, 2022MINUTE ENTRY: STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00REPLY: Reply
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Date: September 16, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.