Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Michael Brown, Heather Brown, filed a(n) Cv case against Alonso Effren, Jane Doe Effren, in the jurisdiction of Graham County, AZ, . Graham County, AZ Superior Courts Graham County Superior with MICHAEL D PETERSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL D PETERSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGraham County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseGraham County Superior |
AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE: Change of Address
Date: December 30, 2021ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: November 23, 2021COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: November 23, 2021NOTICE: COURT NOTICE
Date: November 29, 2021SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 24, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: November 23, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.