Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credit Acceptance Corp., filed a(n) Cv case against J Doe, Amanda Canizales, Jose Canizales, in the jurisdiction of Graham County, AZ, . Graham County, AZ Superior Courts Graham County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGraham County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseGraham County Superior |
MOTION: Extend Time for Service
Date: December 13, 2021SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: October 29, 2021SERVICE: Attempted Service
Date: December 14, 2021SERVICE: Certificate
Date: November 17, 2021APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: December 01, 2021MOTION: MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2021ORDER: Extending Time for Service
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE: COURT NOTICE
Date: November 02, 2021ORDER: ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: October 29, 2021COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.