Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hughes Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Cv case against Cassandra Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Graham County, AZ, . Graham County, AZ Superior Courts Graham County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGraham County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseGraham County Superior |
MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: December 09, 2021MOTION: Motion
Date: January 07, 2022SERVICE: Certificate
Date: November 04, 2021MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: January 07, 2022ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: October 07, 2021APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE: Notice
Date: January 07, 2022SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE: COURT NOTICE
Date: October 11, 2021NOTICE: COURT NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2021COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.