We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Millcreek Ranch Llc Plaintiff Vs Roger A. Faber Et Al. Defendant

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Millcreek Ranch Llc, filed a(n) C83 case against Apache County Treasurer, Judith Ann Faber, Karen Brown, Norman R. Brown, Roger A. Faber, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts Apache County Superior with GARRETT WHITING presiding.

Case Details for Millcreek Ranch Llc v. Apache County Treasurer , et al.

Judge

GARRETT WHITING

Filing Date

May 23, 2023

Category

C83

Last Refreshed

May 26, 2023

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Filing Court House

Apache County Superior

Parties for Millcreek Ranch Llc v. Apache County Treasurer , et al.

Plaintiffs

Millcreek Ranch Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Apache County Treasurer

Judith Ann Faber

Karen Brown

Norman R. Brown

Roger A. Faber

Other Parties

Devin Brown (Attorney)

Law Office Of Devin Brown (Attorney)

Case Documents for Millcreek Ranch Llc v. Apache County Treasurer , et al.

Case Events for Millcreek Ranch Llc v. Apache County Treasurer , et al.

Type Description
ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
SUMMONS: SUMMONS
COMPLAINT: Complaint
See all events

Related Content in Apache County

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RUSSELL NORMAND ROY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400113

Case

FRANK SANSONE PLAINTIFF vs ROXANNE DRYE DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400119

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs JOHN W WATERS et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400110

Case

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC PLAINTIFF vs PAMELA D SKOUSEN DEFENDANT
Jul 01, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400118

Case

CAROL CHRISTOFFERSON PLAINTIFF VS FRANK GONZALES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400120

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs DEWEY BAILEY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400109

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs ALLEN R DOWD et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 18, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400100

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROGER HILL et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400105

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT MEHSRELE et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400106

Case

In RE the Matter Of: DAKOTA DAVIS PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400115

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs NELSON D SMITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400108

Case

WP RE VENTURES, LLC PLAINTIFF vs BETTY SCHRIEBER et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 22, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400102

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs LAURA A DOTY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400114

Case

ERIK ROBERT GARDELLA PLAINTIFF VS GARRY R. KLINGMAN et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 19, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400101

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT P STITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400111

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RONALD PRAIRIE DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400104

Case

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC PLAINTIFF vs ANNA J ARTHUR et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 14, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400099

Case

MARCEL BEHNERT PLAINTIFF vs JACQUELINE A REES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 08, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400122

Case

CONN APPLIANCES, INC PLAINTIFF vs JAMIE TSOSIE DEFENDANT
Jun 25, 2024 | CIVIL | C45 | S0100CV202400103