We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201800036

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201800036

Filing Date

March 06, 2018

Last Refreshed

March 21, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201800036

ORDER: SETTING

Date: March 12, 2018

APPLICATION: APPLICATION

Date: March 06, 2018

Case Events for Cv201800036

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: SETTING
Docket Event APPLICATION: APPLICATION
See all events

Related Content in Apache County

Case

In RE the Matter Of: HARRIET HUBBELL-MIKE PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 11, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400098

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RONALD PRAIRIE DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400104

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs DEWEY BAILEY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400109

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs LAURA A DOTY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400114

Case

In RE the Matter Of: DAKOTA DAVIS PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400115

Case

MARCEL BEHNERT PLAINTIFF vs JACQUELINE A REES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 08, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400122

Case

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC PLAINTIFF vs PAMELA D SKOUSEN DEFENDANT
Jul 01, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400118

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs ALLEN R DOWD et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 18, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400100

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RUSSELL NORMAND ROY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400113

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROGER HILL et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400105

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs JOHN W WATERS et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400110

Case

CAROL CHRISTOFFERSON PLAINTIFF VS FRANK GONZALES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400120

Case

FRANK SANSONE PLAINTIFF vs ROXANNE DRYE DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400119

Case

CONN APPLIANCES, INC PLAINTIFF vs JAMIE TSOSIE DEFENDANT
Jun 25, 2024 | CIVIL | C45 | S0100CV202400103

Case

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC PLAINTIFF vs ANNA J ARTHUR et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 14, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400099

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT MEHSRELE et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400106

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT P STITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400111

Case

ERIK ROBERT GARDELLA PLAINTIFF VS GARRY R. KLINGMAN et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 19, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400101

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs NELSON D SMITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400108

Case

WP RE VENTURES, LLC PLAINTIFF vs BETTY SCHRIEBER et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 22, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400102