We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201400226

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201400226

Filing Date

December 11, 2014

Last Refreshed

March 19, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201400226

NOTICE: Disclosure

Date: May 14, 2015

CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail

Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00

NOTICE: Appearance

Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00

MOTION: Motion

Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00

COMPLAINT: AMENDED COMPLAINT

Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00

ORDER: VACATING

Date: May 26, 2015

MOTION: WITHDRAW

Date: June 08, 2015

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00

NOTICE: SETTLEMENT

Date: October 11, 2016

ANSWER: ANSWER

Date: May 06, 2015

ORDER: SETTING

Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00

MOTION: Motion

Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00

ORDER: Order

Date: June 08, 2015

ORDER: WITHDRAW COUNSEL

Date: October 18, 2016

OBJECTION: Objection

Date: June 10, 2015

MOTION: Appear Telephonically

Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00

ORDER: Reassignment of Judge

Date: October 17, 2016

CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail

Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00

ORDER: Order

Date: 2014-12-17T00:00:00

MOTION: Motion

Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00

ORDER: AMENDED ORDER

Date: 2015-03-20T00:00:00

NOTICE: SETTLEMENT

Date: May 21, 2015

CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail

Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00

MOTION: Appear Telephonically

Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00

CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail

Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00

Case Events for Cv201400226

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Docket Event ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Docket Event NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Docket Event OBJECTION: Objection
Docket Event MOTION: WITHDRAW
Docket Event ORDER: Order
Docket Event ORDER: VACATING
Docket Event NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Docket Event NOTICE: Disclosure
Docket Event ANSWER: ANSWER
See all events

Related Content in Apache County

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RUSSELL NORMAND ROY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400113

Case

FRANK SANSONE PLAINTIFF vs ROXANNE DRYE DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400119

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs JOHN W WATERS et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400110

Case

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC PLAINTIFF vs PAMELA D SKOUSEN DEFENDANT
Jul 01, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400118

Case

CAROL CHRISTOFFERSON PLAINTIFF VS FRANK GONZALES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400120

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs DEWEY BAILEY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400109

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs ALLEN R DOWD et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 18, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400100

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROGER HILL et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400105

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT MEHSRELE et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400106

Case

In RE the Matter Of: DAKOTA DAVIS PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400115

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs NELSON D SMITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400108

Case

WP RE VENTURES, LLC PLAINTIFF vs BETTY SCHRIEBER et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 22, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400102

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs LAURA A DOTY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400114

Case

ERIK ROBERT GARDELLA PLAINTIFF VS GARRY R. KLINGMAN et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 19, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400101

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT P STITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400111

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RONALD PRAIRIE DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400104

Case

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC PLAINTIFF vs ANNA J ARTHUR et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 14, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400099

Case

MARCEL BEHNERT PLAINTIFF vs JACQUELINE A REES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 08, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400122

Case

CONN APPLIANCES, INC PLAINTIFF vs JAMIE TSOSIE DEFENDANT
Jun 25, 2024 | CIVIL | C45 | S0100CV202400103