We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201300218

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201300218

Filing Date

November 19, 2013

Last Refreshed

March 21, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201300218

Case Events for Cv201300218

Type Description
Docket Event JUDGMENT: Default
Docket Event NOTICE: Lodging
Docket Event MinuteEntry event for Minute Entry: Default Judgment
Docket Event ORDER: Order
Docket Event APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Docket Event AFFIDAVIT: DEFAULT
Docket Event SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Docket Event ORDER: ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE
Docket Event MOTION: Extension of Time
Docket Event SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
See all events

Related Content in Apache County

Case

ERIK ROBERT GARDELLA PLAINTIFF VS GARRY R. KLINGMAN et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 19, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400101

Case

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC PLAINTIFF vs PAMELA D SKOUSEN DEFENDANT
Jul 01, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400118

Case

FRANK SANSONE PLAINTIFF vs ROXANNE DRYE DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400119

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs JOHN W WATERS et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400110

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs DEWEY BAILEY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400109

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT MEHSRELE et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400106

Case

MARCEL BEHNERT PLAINTIFF vs JACQUELINE A REES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 08, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400122

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT P STITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400111

Case

JEFFREY AITKEN PLAINTIFF vs STANLEY BALLEJOS DEFENDANT
Jul 18, 2024 | CIVIL | TMV | S0100CV202400125

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs ALLEN R DOWD et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 18, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400100

Case

In RE the Matter Of: MICHELLE JAMIE TERRY PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jul 16, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400123

Case

CAROL CHRISTOFFERSON PLAINTIFF VS FRANK GONZALES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400120

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROGER HILL et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400105

Case

ATWOOD RENTALS INC. PLAINTIFF vs TERESA MURPHY et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 16, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400124

Case

CONN APPLIANCES, INC PLAINTIFF vs JAMIE TSOSIE DEFENDANT
Jun 25, 2024 | CIVIL | C45 | S0100CV202400103

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RUSSELL NORMAND ROY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400113

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RONALD PRAIRIE DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400104

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs LAURA A DOTY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400114

Case

In RE the Matter Of: DAKOTA DAVIS PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400115

Case

WP RE VENTURES, LLC PLAINTIFF vs BETTY SCHRIEBER et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 22, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400102

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs NELSON D SMITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400108