We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201300138

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201300138

Filing Date

July 05, 2013

Last Refreshed

March 28, 2022

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201300138

ANSWER: ANSWER

Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2013-07-05T00:00:00

JUDGMENT: Judgment

Date: January 08, 2014

MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Date: October 17, 2013

NOTICE: Notice

Date: September 30, 2015

STATEMENT: of Facts

Date: October 17, 2013

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: September 29, 2015

NOTICE: Notice

Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00

STATEMENT: of Costs

Date: October 17, 2013

AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT

Date: 2013-10-17T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2013-07-05T00:00:00

ORDER: Order

Date: December 05, 2013

AFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

Date: 2013-10-17T00:00:00

APPLICATION: FOR DEFAULT

Date: 2013-09-04T00:00:00

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: August 18, 2015

ORDER: Order

Date: 2013-09-05T00:00:00

ANSWER: ANSWER

Date: September 14, 2015

NOTICE: OF DISMISSAL / PARTY

Date: 2013-10-17T00:00:00

Case Events for Cv201300138

Type Description
Docket Event NOTICE: Notice
Docket Event SERVICE: Certificate
Docket Event ANSWER: ANSWER
Docket Event SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Docket Event APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Docket Event JUDGMENT: Judgment
Docket Event ORDER: Order
Docket Event MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Docket Event STATEMENT: of Facts
Docket Event STATEMENT: of Costs
See all events

Related Content in Apache County

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RUSSELL NORMAND ROY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400113

Case

FRANK SANSONE PLAINTIFF vs ROXANNE DRYE DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400119

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs JOHN W WATERS et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400110

Case

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC PLAINTIFF vs PAMELA D SKOUSEN DEFENDANT
Jul 01, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400118

Case

CAROL CHRISTOFFERSON PLAINTIFF VS FRANK GONZALES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400120

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs DEWEY BAILEY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400109

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs ALLEN R DOWD et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 18, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400100

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROGER HILL et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400105

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT MEHSRELE et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400106

Case

In RE the Matter Of: DAKOTA DAVIS PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400115

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs NELSON D SMITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400108

Case

WP RE VENTURES, LLC PLAINTIFF vs BETTY SCHRIEBER et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 22, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400102

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs LAURA A DOTY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400114

Case

ERIK ROBERT GARDELLA PLAINTIFF VS GARRY R. KLINGMAN et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 19, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400101

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT P STITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400111

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RONALD PRAIRIE DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400104

Case

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC PLAINTIFF vs ANNA J ARTHUR et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 14, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400099

Case

MARCEL BEHNERT PLAINTIFF vs JACQUELINE A REES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 08, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400122

Case

CONN APPLIANCES, INC PLAINTIFF vs JAMIE TSOSIE DEFENDANT
Jun 25, 2024 | CIVIL | C45 | S0100CV202400103