We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cv201300058

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Apache County, AZ, . Apache County, AZ Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cv201300058

Filing Date

March 19, 2013

Last Refreshed

December 14, 2021

Filing Location

Apache County, AZ

Case Documents for Cv201300058

Case Events for Cv201300058

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: Dismissing Case
Docket Event STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Docket Event NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Docket Event SERVICE: Proof of Notice
Docket Event DEMAND: Demand for Jury Trial
Docket Event ARBITRATION: Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Event NOTICE: Notice
Docket Event ANSWER: ANSWER
Docket Event CERTIFICATE: TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATE
See all events

Related Content in Apache County

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RUSSELL NORMAND ROY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400113

Case

FRANK SANSONE PLAINTIFF vs ROXANNE DRYE DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400119

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs JOHN W WATERS et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400110

Case

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC PLAINTIFF vs PAMELA D SKOUSEN DEFENDANT
Jul 01, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400118

Case

CAROL CHRISTOFFERSON PLAINTIFF VS FRANK GONZALES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 02, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400120

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs DEWEY BAILEY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400109

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs ALLEN R DOWD et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 18, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400100

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROGER HILL et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400105

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT MEHSRELE et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400106

Case

In RE the Matter Of: DAKOTA DAVIS PETITIONER, PETITIONER
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | C43 | S0100CV202400115

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs NELSON D SMITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400108

Case

WP RE VENTURES, LLC PLAINTIFF vs BETTY SCHRIEBER et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 22, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400102

Case

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. PLAINTIFF vs LAURA A DOTY et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 27, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400114

Case

ERIK ROBERT GARDELLA PLAINTIFF VS GARRY R. KLINGMAN et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 19, 2024 | CIVIL | C83 | S0100CV202400101

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs ROBERT P STITH et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400111

Case

2 GUYS INVESTMENTS, LLC PLAINTIFF vs RONALD PRAIRIE DEFENDANT
Jun 26, 2024 | CIVIL | RP | S0100CV202400104

Case

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC PLAINTIFF vs ANNA J ARTHUR et al. DEFENDANT
Jun 14, 2024 | CIVIL | CO | S0100CV202400099

Case

MARCEL BEHNERT PLAINTIFF vs JACQUELINE A REES et al. DEFENDANT
Jul 08, 2024 | CIVIL | C56 | S0100CV202400122

Case

CONN APPLIANCES, INC PLAINTIFF vs JAMIE TSOSIE DEFENDANT
Jun 25, 2024 | CIVIL | C45 | S0100CV202400103