We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Bank Of Commerce Vs Ross, Franetta

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Bank Of Commerce, filed a(n) case against Ross, Franetta, in the jurisdiction of Adair County, OK, . Adair County, OK Superior Courts with Wells, Holli presiding.

Case Details for Bank Of Commerce v. Ross, Franetta

Judge

Wells, Holli

Filing Date

August 11, 2010

Last Refreshed

September 27, 2022

Filing Location

Adair County, OK

Parties for Bank Of Commerce v. Ross, Franetta

Plaintiffs

Bank Of Commerce

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Ross, Franetta

Case Documents for Bank Of Commerce v. Ross, Franetta

Case Events for Bank Of Commerce v. Ross, Franetta

Type Description
Docket Event COURT MINUTE
Docket Event JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Docket Event RETURN AFFIDAVIT / ORDER AND SUMMONS SERVED 8-18-10
Docket Event AFFIDAVIT/ ORDER AND SUMMONS
Docket Event OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE WELLS, HOLLI TO THIS CASE.
Docket Event COVER SHEET
Docket Event DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE
Docket Event LAW LIBRARY FEE
Docket Event RECEIPT # 2010-47734 ON 08/11/2010. PAYOR:BANK OF COMMERCE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $53.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2010-271: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2010-271: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE. SC-2010-271: $2.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES.
Docket Event INDEBTEDNESS <$1500.
See all events

Related Content in Adair County

Case

KATHERINE LOUISE KRAMER v. EDUARDO RAFAEL GARZA-JIMENEZ
Jul 01, 2024 | BROWN, L | FP-2024-4

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. GABRIEL VELEZ
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-115

Case

CJ-2023-65
Oct 27, 2023 | PAYTON, J | CJ-2023-65

Case

DONNA COURSEY v. STILWELL NURSING AND REHAB
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CJ-2024-46

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. KELLY WAYNE LANKFORD
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-114

Case

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE v. ELIZABETH HALL
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-80

Case

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. KRISTOPHER TEED
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CS-2024-83

Case

ADAIR COUNTYCOURT CLERK OFFICE MAY 2024
May 06, 2024 | Unassigned | MR-2024-00005

Case

T D BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. SPENCER COMINGDEER
Jun 20, 2024 | BROWN, L | CJ-2024-45

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. JARED PELFREY
Jun 17, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-110

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. PASSION STIGLEMAN
Jun 13, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-109

Document

CS-2024-79
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-79

Document

CS-2024-79
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-79

Document

SC-2024-169
Jun 20, 2024 | Gary Huggins | SC-2024-169

Document

CS-2024-80
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-80

Document

In Re the marriage of MAYYING VANG v. TOUTOUA LO
Nov 17, 2023 | PAYTON, J | FD-2023-75

Document

FD-2024-36
Jun 20, 2024 | L. Elizabeth Brown | FD-2024-36

Document

CJ-2024-45
Jun 20, 2024 | L. Elizabeth Brown | CJ-2024-45

Document

SC-2024-168
Jun 20, 2024 | Gary Huggins | SC-2024-168

Document

CS-2024-80
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-80

Document

CJ-2024-45
Jun 20, 2024 | L. Elizabeth Brown | CJ-2024-45