We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Oklahoma V. John Gabriel Mankiller

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Adair County, OK, . Adair County, OK Superior Courts adair County with L. Elizabeth Brown presiding.

Case Details for State Of Oklahoma V. John Gabriel Mankiller

Judge

L. Elizabeth Brown

Filing Date

April 23, 2018

Last Refreshed

June 13, 2022

Filing Location

Adair County, OK

Filing Court House

adair County

Case Events for State Of Oklahoma V. John Gabriel Mankiller

Type Description
Docket Event COST ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT SET AT $25.00, ONCE A MONTH, BEGINNING 7/10/2022 - PP-AD-2022-234
Docket Event RECEIPT # 2022-140544 ON 03/21/2022. PAYOR: JOHN GABRIEL MANKILLER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 20.00. LINE ITEMS: CM-2018-160: $8.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR MANKILLER, JOHN GABRIEL. CM-2018-160: $9.60 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR MANKILLER, JOHN GABRIEL. CM-2018-160: $2.40 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR MANKILLER, JOHN GABRIEL.
Docket Event RECEIPT # 2022-139498 ON 01/06/2022. PAYOR: JOHN GABRIEL MANKILLER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 75.00. LINE ITEMS: CM-2018-160: $75.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR MANKILLER, JOHN GABRIEL.
Docket Event LETTER
Docket Event INSTALLMENT ORDER $100 A MONTH STARTING 07/01/2021
Docket Event CLAIM FOR INTERCEPT OF TAX REFUND
Docket Event INSTALLMENT ORDER- $100 MO STARTING FEB 1
Docket Event CLAIM FOR INTERCEPT OF TAX REFUND
Docket Event LETTER FROM JOHN MANKILLER
Docket Event RULES & CONDITIONS OF DISTRICT ATTORNEY SUPERVISED PROBATION
See all events

Related Content in Adair County

Case

KATHERINE LOUISE KRAMER v. EDUARDO RAFAEL GARZA-JIMENEZ
Jul 01, 2024 | BROWN, L | FP-2024-4

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. GABRIEL VELEZ
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-115

Case

CJ-2023-65
Oct 27, 2023 | PAYTON, J | CJ-2023-65

Case

DONNA COURSEY v. STILWELL NURSING AND REHAB
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CJ-2024-46

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. KELLY WAYNE LANKFORD
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-114

Case

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE v. ELIZABETH HALL
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-80

Case

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. KRISTOPHER TEED
Jun 24, 2024 | BROWN, L | CS-2024-83

Case

ADAIR COUNTYCOURT CLERK OFFICE MAY 2024
May 06, 2024 | Unassigned | MR-2024-00005

Case

T D BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. SPENCER COMINGDEER
Jun 20, 2024 | BROWN, L | CJ-2024-45

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. JARED PELFREY
Jun 17, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-110

Case

STATE OF OKLAHOMA v. PASSION STIGLEMAN
Jun 13, 2024 | BROWN, L | CM-2024-109

Document

CS-2024-79
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-79

Document

CS-2024-79
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-79

Document

SC-2024-169
Jun 20, 2024 | Gary Huggins | SC-2024-169

Document

CS-2024-80
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-80

Document

In Re the marriage of MAYYING VANG v. TOUTOUA LO
Nov 17, 2023 | PAYTON, J | FD-2023-75

Document

FD-2024-36
Jun 20, 2024 | L. Elizabeth Brown | FD-2024-36

Document

CJ-2024-45
Jun 20, 2024 | L. Elizabeth Brown | CJ-2024-45

Document

SC-2024-168
Jun 20, 2024 | Gary Huggins | SC-2024-168

Document

CS-2024-80
Jun 20, 2024 | PAYTON, J | CS-2024-80

Document

CJ-2024-45
Jun 20, 2024 | L. Elizabeth Brown | CJ-2024-45