Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ezerski, Carl Francis, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Ezerski, Deborah, Ezerski, Carl Francis, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2009 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Appeal Judgment | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Remanded to Court's Control | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Remanded to Court's Control | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Appeal Judgment | |
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Records Lodged | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Appeals Hearing | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Appeal Certified to Court of Appeal | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal: Appellate Division | |
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.