Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ohio Department Of Taxation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jackson, Nathaniel W., against Vanflea Trading Llc, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with PEELER, ROBERT W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEELER, ROBERT W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED-COMPLETED (SVC ISSUED 2-3-23) TO US BANK: CM 2-8-23 BY ? | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT ON BANK ACCOUNT-US BANK;CM ISSUED TO BANK ON 2/3/23;OM ISSUED TO DEFENDANT ON 2/7/23 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: JACKSON, NATHANIEL W. ASSIGNED | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE PEELER, ROBERT W.: ASSIGNED | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 01/31/2023 CASE NUMBER 23EX011846 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.