Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Riverwalk Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Good, Darcy Mehling, against Capital One Bank, Hollon, Sheryl, Us Bank Trust National Association, Hollon, Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with TEPE, TIMOTHY N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTEPE, TIMOTHY N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (JOURNAL BOOK 1339 PAGE 369) | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY AND ORDER | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR PRO TRUST 2017-RPL1 | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ANSWER INSTANTER | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SENT | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COPY ISSUED WARREN COUNTY TREASURER | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED. REASON: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SENT TO BE SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: HOLLON, SHERYL | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SENT TO BE SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.