Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Palumbo, Alexxis J, against Shipley, James, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with ODA II, DONALD E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeODA II, DONALD E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1341 PAGE 668) | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULE SET | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SENT TO BE SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: SHIPLEY, JAMES | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY - CM | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: PALUMBO, ALEXXIS J ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.