Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Other Civil case against Howard, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with TEPE, TIMOTHY N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTEPE, TIMOTHY N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1358 PAGE 74) | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULE SET | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR 09/26/2023 AT 10:30 AM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: TEPE, TIMOTHY N. | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR 09/26/2023 AT 10:30 AM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: MOLL, MARKUS L | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/03/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN PHONE/ , HEARD BY: MOLL, MARKUS L | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULE SET | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/03/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN PHONE/ , HEARD BY: TEPE, TIMOTHY N. | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDINARY MAIL SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.