Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pnc Bank Na, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Fitzgibbon, Brittany, against Schira, Erin M, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with PEELER, ROBERT W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEELER, ROBERT W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1279 PAGE 354) | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY PERSONAL/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED TO: SCHIRA, ERIN M: PS ON 12/10/21 BY PROCESS SERVER AARON GRIMES | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED12/9/21 TO: SCHIRA, ERIN M: CM ON 12/11/21 BY ES | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 21CV094755 | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: FITZGIBBON, BRITTANY ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.